Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan de Zuazo y Tejada, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1674Born
27 Feb 173661.7AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
4 Apr 173661.8DiedBishop-Elect of Orense, Spain
8 Apr 173661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Juan de Zuazo y Tejada
Father Juan de Zuazo y Tejada O.M. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for -.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Sep 2020

Quantcast