Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Zorzi (Giorgi)

Deceased

Bishop of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1592AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
4 Mar 1596AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
26 Oct 1596ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
28 Aug 1631DiedBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marino Zorzi (Giorgi) (VIAF: 88782642)
Bishop Marino Zorzi (Giorgi) (died ) Bishop of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 140
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018