Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Eglescliffe (Wishart), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1318AppointedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
17 Jul 1318Ordained BishopBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
1322²AppointedBishop of Connor, Ireland
20 Jun 1323AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
2 Jan 1347DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for John Eglescliffe (Wishart):
Bishop John Eglescliffe (Wishart) O.P. (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 264, and Page 202
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 292
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,514
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 246
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013