Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Martin (Stephan) Werlen, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1962 BornGeschinen
7 Oct 198422.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 Jun 198826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Nov 200139.6SelectedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
21 Nov 200139.6ConfirmedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
16 Dec 200139.7InstalledAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
4 Oct 201351.5ResignedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Martin (Stephan) Werlen:
Abbot Martin (Stephan) Werlen O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Maria Einsiedeln.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Oct 2013