Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Wengham

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jun 1259AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
15 Feb 1260Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 1262DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Wengham
Bishop Henry Wengham (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 62
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast