Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre von Wedberch

Deceased

Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1471AppointedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
7 Jul 1471Ordained BishopBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
21 Nov 1491³DiedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre von Wedberch
Bishop Pierre von Wedberch (died ) Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHospice Teutonique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,517
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,471, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast