Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Waynflete (Pattyn)

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1398BornWainfleet, Lincolnshire
21 Jan 142628.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 144749.4AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
30 Jul 144749.6Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
11 Aug 148688.6DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Waynflete (Pattyn):
Bishop William Waynflete (Pattyn) (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 269
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013