Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Wauchope

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1539AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
17 Mar 1545Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
10 Nov 1551DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Robert Wauchope (VIAF: 45180784)
Archbishop Robert Wauchope (died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNidrie Marischal
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018