Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Walpole

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Nov 1288SelectedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
1 Feb 1289ConfirmedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 1289Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
15 Jul 1299AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 1302DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Walpole
Bishop Ralph Walpole (died ) Bishop of Ely

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238, and Page 371
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 67
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 332
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 462
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,916

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast