Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Viole

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1564AppointedBishop of Paris, France
18 Mar 1565Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
4 May 1568DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Viole (VIAF: 207183898)
Bishop Guillaume Viole (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018