Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Ville-sur-Illon

Deceased

Bishop of Toul, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1408AppointedBishop of Toul, France
20 Mar 1409Ordained BishopBishop of Toul, France
12 Mar 1436DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Ville-sur-Illon
Bishop Henri de Ville-sur-Illon (died ) Bishop of Toul

EventPlace
Death PlaceLiverdun

  • a bishop for 26.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 503
  • ob: CB, 7 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 8 Apr 2020

Quantcast