Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elzéar de Villeneuve

Deceased

Bishop of Digne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1327AppointedBishop of Digne, France
17 Apr 1328Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
7 Oct 1341DiedBishop of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for Elzéar de Villeneuve
Bishop Elzéar de Villeneuve (died ) Bishop of Digne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 224
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,908

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast