Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Vialardi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1572AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Jul 1572Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
4 Dec 1576DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vialardi
Archbishop Antonio Vialardi O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Bourges

EventPlace
Ordained BishopTrinite au Monte Pincio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 135
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 20, Number 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018