Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Veysey (Harman)

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1462Born
31 Aug 151957.7AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 151957.8Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
14 Aug 155189.6ResignedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
28 Sep 155391.7AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
23 Oct 155492.8DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Veysey (Harman):
Bishop John Veysey (Harman) (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 193
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013