Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Versailles, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Mar 1432AppointedBishop of Digne, France
25 Sep 1439AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
11 Nov 1446DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Versailles
Bishop Pierre de Versailles O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 144, and Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018