Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Schedemeker, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Halberstadt

Titular Bishop of Budua


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1438AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Halberstadt, Germany
27 Jun 1438AppointedTitular Bishop of Budua
14 Jun 1439Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Budua
14 Mar 1452DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Halberstadt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Schedemeker:
Bishop Johann Schedemeker O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Halberstadt

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 112
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,740

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013