Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Taddeo Luigi Cardinal dal Verme

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1641Born
20 Dec 168847.8AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
2 Jan 168947.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
12 Dec 169554.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169654.8AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
2 Jan 169654.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
24 Feb 169655.0InstalledBishop of Imola, Italy
14 Mar 170160.0AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
12 Jan 171775.9DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Taddeo Luigi dal Verme
Taddeo Luigi Cardinal dal Verme (born , died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a bishop for 28.0 years
  • a cardinal for 21.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • ob: CB, 13 May 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,681
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast