Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Vend˘me

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1612BornParis, France
7 Mar 166754.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jul 166754.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
12 Aug 166956.9DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

MicroData Summary for Louis de Vend˘me:
Cardinal Louis de Vend˘me (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)

  • a cardinal for 2.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Mar 1667

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013