Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold von Egloffstein

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1336AppointedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Jun 1336Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
27 Jun 1344DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold von Egloffstein (VIAF: 67625417)
Bishop Leopold von Egloffstein (died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,211

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast