Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolphe von der Mark

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Apr 1313AppointedBishop of Liège, Belgium
3 Jun 1313Ordained BishopBishop of Liège, Belgium
3 Nov 1344DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Adolphe von der Mark
Bishop Adolphe von der Mark (died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 302
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast