Catholic-Hierarchy DC

István Cardinal Várdai

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1425¹Born
25 Feb 145732.1AppointedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
18 Sep 146742.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 May 146843.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
22 Feb 1471³46.1DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for István Várdai
István Cardinal Várdai (born 1425, died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzabolcs
Death PlaceKalocsa, Archdiocese of Kalocsa

  • a cardinal for 3.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 132
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,457, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast