Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Javier Valdivia Pinedo

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Linares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1885BornOvalle
25 Dec 190823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
27 Jul 194055.1AppointedBishop of Linares, Chile
Sep 1940²55.2ResignedBishop-Elect of Linares, Chile
17 Jun 195166.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Linares, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Valdivia Pinedo:
Father Francisco Javier Valdivia Pinedo (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Linares

  • a priest for 42.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015