Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de La Valette Cornusson

Deceased

Bishop of Vabres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornCornusson
8 Jan 161828.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vabres, France
8 Jan 161828.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
4 Mar 161828.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
2 Aug 162232.5SucceededBishop of Vabres, France
20 Nov 164454.8DiedBishop of Vabres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de La Valette Cornusson:
Bishop François de La Valette Cornusson (died ) Bishop of Vabres

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279, and Page 356
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 64, Number 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015