Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Friedrich Truchseß von Emmerberg

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1393Born
30 Sep 144148.7SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
11 Dec 144148.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
28 Jan 144249.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
4 Apr 145259.2DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Truchseß von Emmerberg:
Archbishop Friedrich Truchseß von Emmerberg (born 1393, died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 228
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,750

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015