Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Trzebicki

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1607Born
12 Dec 165447.0AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Sep 165547.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Feb 165850.2AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
28 Dec 167972.0DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Trzebicki
Bishop Andrzej Trzebicki (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrzebiczna

  • a bishop for 24.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167, and Page 288
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast