Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Jan Koryciński

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Mar 1667AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
27 Nov 1667Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
30 Jun 1670AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
17 Jan 1677DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Jan Koryciński:
Archbishop Wojciech Jan Koryciński (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 192, Number 15,590
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015