Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Torres Grijalba, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornMadrid
13 Jan 164863.0AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
29 Mar 164863.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
4 Sep 166277.7DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Torres Grijalba:
Bishop Francisco Torres Grijalba O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,863
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 243
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 177, Number 1,105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014