Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikola Tomašić

Deceased

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1686Born
5 Apr 171023.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Apr 171023.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jan 172235.0AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
9 Aug 172235.6Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
1732¹45.0DiedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nikola Tomašić
Bishop Nikola Tomašić (born , died 1732) Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePostirae

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017