Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Wallensis (Welchmann)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1247AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
26 Jul 1248Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
11 Jul 1255DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Wallensis (Welchmann)
Bishop Thomas Wallensis (Welchmann) (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 292
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,566

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast