Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín Terrer Valenzuela, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552¹Born
10 Mar 159341.1AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
30 May 159341.4Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
21 Jun 159644.4AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
7 Apr 161462.2AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
22 Apr 163078.3AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
28 Nov 163179.9DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín Terrer Valenzuela
Archbishop Martín Terrer Valenzuela O.S.A. (born 1552, died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaroca, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopLa Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 126
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100, and Page 310
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,495
  • bp/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 105, Number 667
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 331, and Page 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018