Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Tecchi

Deceased

Pro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1854Born
23 Dec 187622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
25 May 191459.9Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 191459.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
8 Nov 191460.3AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
7 Feb 191560.6DiedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Scipione Tecchi
Scipione Cardinal Tecchi (born , died ) Pro-Prefect of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a cardinal for .7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018