Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Taufers

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1228¹AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
19 Mar 1228Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
18 Nov 1239DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Taufers (VIAF: 316876319)
Bishop Heinrich von Taufers (died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopVenezia, Diocese of Castello

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast