Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albrecht de Kevenburg (Käfernburg)

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1170¹Born
15 Feb 120636.1AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
24 Dec 120636.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
15 Oct 123262.7DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albrecht de Kevenburg (Käfernburg): VIAF:52482868
Archbishop Albrecht de Kevenburg (Käfernburg) (born 1170, died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 320
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,060

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 24 Jan 2016