Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Konrad Tanner, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1752Born
8 Sep 177219.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
May 1777³24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1808²55.0AppointedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
7 Apr 182572.2DiedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konrad Tanner (VIAF: 37824262)
Abbot Konrad Tanner O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln

  • a priest for 47.9 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast