Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni dei Tagliacozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Oct 1535AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
7 Dec 1535Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
5 Oct 1540DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni dei Tagliacozzi
Bishop Giovanni dei Tagliacozzi (died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018