Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isarnus Tacconi (Morlane)

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1300AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
11 Apr 1302AppointedArchbishop of Lund, Sweden
12 Jun 1310AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
Sep 1310²DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isarnus Tacconi (Morlane)
Archbishop Isarnus Tacconi (Morlane) (died Sep 1310) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 317, and Page 429
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast