Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Strozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1516¹Born
3 Apr 156650.2AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
28 Apr 156650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
4 Apr 156852.2DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Strozzi
Bishop Alessandro Strozzi (born 1516, died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Vincenzio d’Annalena, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2015
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast