Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Strong

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1582AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
13 May 1582Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
20 Jan 1597AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
20 Jan 1601³DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Strong:
Bishop Thomas Strong (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 94, Number 586
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015