Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Stritch

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1705¹Born
8 Mar 173227.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 174338.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
18 Dec 174338.9ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
18 Dec 174338.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
1744¹39.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos
20 Feb 174540.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Thomas Stritch
Bishop Thomas Stritch (born 1705, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClonmel, Co. Tipperary
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 12.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 396, and Page 446
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 40
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast