Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Stridoni, O. Crucif. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mylopotamos, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1582AppointedBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece
17 Jun 1582Ordained BishopBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece
1588¹DiedBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Stridoni
Bishop Nicola Stridoni O. Crucif. (died 1588) Bishop of Mylopotamos

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Blaise, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 244
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018