Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Stretton

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1360AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
27 Sep 1360Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 1385DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Stretton
Bishop Robert Stretton (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFulham

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 208
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 78
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 550
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast