Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Sheppey

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1352AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 1353Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
19 Oct 1360DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Sheppey
Bishop John Sheppey (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Southwarn

  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 422
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 77
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 563
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,798

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast