Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Georg Franz von Stinglheim

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1702Born
22 Sep 172523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
14 Oct 172523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
11 Feb 175451.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
11 Feb 175451.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
24 Mar 175451.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
15 Sep 175957.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg Franz von Stinglheim (VIAF: 10904997)
Bishop Johann Georg Franz von Stinglheim (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKürn

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,308
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128, and Page 453
  • mn/bd: CB, 24 Jan 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast