Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Christian Adam von Königsfeld

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Erythrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1681³BornZaitzkofen
22 Dec 171433.9Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
21 Apr 174665.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
1749¹67.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
6 Jul 176685.4DiedTitular Bishop of Erythrae

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Christian Adam von Königsfeld:
Bishop Johann Christian Adam von Königsfeld (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Erythrae

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015