Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Stella, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia


Events

DateEventTitle
9 May 1544AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Adria, Italy
9 May 1544AppointedBishop of Salpi (Salapia), Italy
18 May 1544Ordained BishopBishop of Salpi (Salapia), Italy
22 Apr 1547AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
21 Aug 1549AppointedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia
6 Jan 1566DiedBishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper), Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Stella (VIAF: 27215640)
Bishop Tommaso Stella O.P. (died ) Bishop of Capodistria (Capo d’Istria)(Koper)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 221, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast