Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Stanley, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465Born
18 Jul 150641.5AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
8 Nov 150641.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 151550.2DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Stanley
Bishop James Stanley O. Praem. (born 1465, died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 191
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1506, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 May 2018

Quantcast