Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stanberry (Stanbury), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1448AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
23 Jun 1448Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
7 Feb 1453AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
11 May 1474DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Stanberry (Stanbury):
Bishop John Stanberry (Stanbury) O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 102, and Page 466
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013