Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michal Mateusz Stadnicki, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1747BornWielka Wiesk
16 Jul 176315.8ProfessedMember of Order of the Pious Schools
26 May 177123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
177527.2IncardinatedPriest
15 Mar 178335.4ProfessedPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Mar 178436.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Jan 178739.2SucceededBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Jun 179749.7DiedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Michal Mateusz Stadnicki:
Bishop Michal Mateusz Stadnicki O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

  • a priest for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,640
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015