Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Sprowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1453SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
15 Oct 1453ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
6 Jan 1454Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Apr 1464DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Sprowski
Archbishop Jan Sprowski (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,454, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast