Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Gruszczyński

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1405¹Born
12 Jan 145146.0AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
14 Dec 146358.9AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
19 Oct 146459.7AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
8 Oct 147368.7DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Gruszczyński
Archbishop Jan Gruszczyński (born 1405, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 160, and Page 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast